No. 19-1114
Title:National Collegiate Athletic Association, et al., Petitioners
v.
New Jersey Thoroughbred Horsemen's Association, Inc.
Docketed:March 11, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3550)
   Decision Date:September 24, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 10, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: National Collegiate Athletic Association, an unincorporated association, et al.