No. 19-1108
Title:DeRay McKesson, Petitioner
v.
John Doe
Docketed:March 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-30864)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 28, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Thomas Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Donahue, Goldberg, Weaver & Littleton
109 South Fifth Street, Suite 4201
Brooklyn, NY 11249

david@donahuegoldberg.com
2123348813
Party name: DeRay McKesson