No. 19-1106 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden, Petitioner
v.
Roderick L. Smith
Docketed:March 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-6184)
   Decision Date:August 26, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 2, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2020 to May 25, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 26, 2020. See Rule 30.1.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Caroline Elizabeth Jane Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Oklahoma Attorney General's Office
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

caroline.hunt@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: Tommy Sharp, Interim Warden
Attorneys for Respondent
Emma Victoria Rolls
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
215 Dean A. McGee, Suite 707
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

emma_rolls@fd.org
405-609-5975
Party name: Roderick Smith