No. 19-1104
Title:Mark Janus, Petitioner
v.
American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, Council 31, et al.
Docketed:March 10, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1553)
   Decision Date:November 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 09 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 9, 2020 to May 11, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2020, for all respondents.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William L. Messenger
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wlm@nrtw.org
7033218510
Party name: Mark Janus
Attorneys for Respondents
John Miller West
    Counsel of Record
Bredhoff & Kaiser, P.L.L.C.
805 15th Street NW - Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20005

jwest@bredhoff.com
202-842-2600
Party name: American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees, Council 31, et al.