No. 19-1099
Title:City of Bakersfield, California, et al., Petitioners
v.
Leslie Laray Crawford
Docketed:March 9, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17138)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 05 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/15/2020.
May 12 2020Response Requested. (Due June 11, 2020)
Jun 11 2020Brief of respondent Leslie Laray Crawford in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael George Marderosian
    Counsel of Record
Marderosian & Cohen, A Professional Corporation
1260 Fulton Street
Fresno, CA 93721

kate@mcc-legal.com
5594417991
Party name: City of Bakersfield, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Emily Tomoko Barner Kuwahara
    Counsel of Record
Crowell & Moring LLP
515 S. Flower St. 40th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071

ekuwahara@crowell.com
213-622-4750
Party name: Leslie Laray Crawford