No. 19-1098
Title:National Football League, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ninth Inning, Inc., et al.
Docketed:March 9, 2020
Linked with 19A606
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-56119)
   Decision Date:August 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 10, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2019Application (19A606) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 8, 2020 to February 7, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Application (19A606) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 7, 2020.
Feb 07 2020Motion (19M107) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal filed.
Feb 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 8, 2020)
PetitionAppendixAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
Feb 19 2020MOTION (19M107) DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/6/2020.
Mar 09 2020Motion (19M107) for leave to file a petition for a writ of certiorari with the supplemental appendix under seal Granted.
Apr 07 2020Waiver of right of respondents Ninth Inning, Inc., et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 08 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 08 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of The United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Antitrust Law and Business School Professors and Economists filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 08 2020Brief amici curiae of Expert Antitrust Economists filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 15 2020Response Requested. (Due May 15, 2020)
Apr 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 15, 2020 to July 14, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 14, 2020.
Jul 14 2020Brief of respondents Ninth Inning, Inc., et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 15 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from July 29, 2020 to August 12, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 17 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari until August 12, 2020, granted.
Aug 11 2020Reply of petitioners National Football League, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 12 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregg H. Levy
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 Tenth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

glevy@cov.com
(202) 662-6000
Party name: National Football League, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Arun Srinivas Subramanian
    Counsel of Record
Susman Godfrey LLP
1301 Avenue of the Americas
32nd Fl.
New York, NY 10019

asubramanian@susmangodfrey.com
2124718346
Party name: Ninth Inning, Inc., et al.
Other
Christopher John Kelly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
Two Palo Alto Square
Suite 300
Palo Alto, CA 94306

cjkelly@mayerbrown.com
650-331-2000
Party name: Expert Antitrust Economists
Jack Edward Pace III
    Counsel of Record
White & Case LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10020

jpace@whitecase.com
(212) 819-8200
Party name: Antitrust Law and Business School Professors and Economists
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
2001 K Street N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of The United States of America