No. 19-1094 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:James Milton Dailey, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:March 5, 2020
Linked with 19A827
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC19-1780, SC19-1797)
   Decision Date:November 12, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 21 2020Application (19A827) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 10, 2020 to March 1, 2020, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 26 2020Application (19A827) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until March 1, 2020.
Mar 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2020 to May 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 6, 2020.
May 06 2020Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOther
May 19 2020Motion of petitioner to delay distribution of the petition for a writ of certiorari under Rule 15.5 from May 26, 2020 to June16, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 21 2020Motion to delay distribution of the petition for a writ certiorari granted; the petition will be distributed on June 17, 2020.
Jun 16 2020Reply of petitioner James Milton Dailey filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 17 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Charles Rothfeld
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

crothfeld@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: James Milton Dailey
Attorneys for Respondent
Amitabh Agarwal
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
The Capitol PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

amit.agarwal@myfloridalegal.com
850-414-3688
Party name: Florida