No. 19-1091
Title:Steve Ray Evans, Petitioner
v.
Sandy City, Utah, et al.
Docketed:March 5, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4179)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 6, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2020Waiver of right of respondent Sandy City, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 07 2020Response Requested. (Due May 7, 2020)
May 01 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 7, 2020 to June 8, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 04 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 8, 2020.
Jun 08 2020Brief of respondents Sandy City, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jun 23 2020Reply of petitioner Steve Ray Evans filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 24 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kevin Paul Martin
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Avenue
Boston, MA 02210

kmartin@goodwinlaw.com
6175701000
Party name: Steve Ray Evans
Attorneys for Respondents
Troy L. Booher
    Counsel of Record
Zimmerman Booher
341 South Main Street, Suite 400
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

tbooher@zbappeals.com
8019240200
Party name: Sandy City, et al.