No. 19-1085
Title:Shannon Deasey, et al., Petitioners
v.
Daniella Slater, et al.
Docketed:March 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-56708, 17-56751)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 15 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.
Apr 29 2020Response Requested. (Due May 29, 2020)
May 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 29, 2020 to June 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2020.
Jun 25 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 29, 2020 to July 29, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 26 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including July 29, 2020.
Jul 21 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 29, 2020 to August 28, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 22 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 28, 2020.
Aug 28 2020Brief of respondents Daniella Slater, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 14 2020Reply of petitioners Deputy Shannon Deasey, Deputy Peter Gentry, Deputy Gary Brandt, Sgt. Mike Rude, and County of San Bernardino filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 16 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/9/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Kevin Harold Louth
    Counsel of Record
Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
800 S. Figueroa Street
15th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

khl@manningllp.com
213-624-6900
Party name: Deputy Shannon Deasey, Deputy Peter Gentry, Deputy Gary Brandt, Sgt. Mike Rude, and County of San Bernardino
Kevin Harold Louth
    Counsel of Record
Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester LLP
800 S. Figueroa Street
15th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

khl@manningllp.com
213-624-6900
Party name: Shannon Deasey, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Daniella Slater, et al.
Dale K. GalipoLaw Offices of Dale K. Galipo
21800 Burbank Boulevard, Suite 310
Woodland Hills, CA 90367

dalekgalipo@yahoo.com
818-347-3333
Party name: Daniella Slater, et al.