No. 19-1081
Title:Arlene Rosenblatt, Petitioner
v.
City of Santa Monica, California, et al.
Docketed:March 4, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-55879)
   Decision Date:October 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 2, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 3, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Lawrence Esensten
    Counsel of Record
Esensten Law
12100 Wilshire Blvd.
Suite 1660
Los Angeles, CA 90025

msilver@esenstenlaw.com
(310) 273-3090
Party name: Arlene Rosenblatt