No. 19-1080
Vide 19-963
Title:Archer and White Sales, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Henry Schein, Inc.
Docketed:March 3, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-41674)
   Decision Date:August 14, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:December 6, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 02 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 2, 2020 to May 1, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 1, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lewis T. LeClair
    Counsel of Record
McKool Smith
300 Cresent Court
Suite 1500
Dallas, TX 75201

lleclair@mckoolsmith.com
214-978-4984
Party name: Archer and White Sales, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

kshanmugam@paulweiss.com
(202) 223-7300
Party name: Henry Schein, Inc.