No. 19-1070
Title:Jeffrey Alan Olson, Petitioner
v.
Pennsylvania
Docketed:February 28, 2020
Linked with 19A807
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Pennsylvania, Western District
   Case Numbers:(26 WAP 2018)
   Decision Date:October 31, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 16 2020Application (19A807) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 29, 2020 to February 28, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Application (19A807) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 28, 2020.
Feb 28 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 16 2020Waiver of right of respondent Pennsylvania to respond filed.
Main Document
Apr 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 06 2020Response Requested. (Due May 6, 2020)
May 01 2020Brief of respondent Pennsylvania in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 13 2020Brief of Pennsylvania in opposition not accepted for filing. (May 18, 2020)(Dupilicate submission)
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.
May 20 2020Reply of petitioner Jeffrey Olson filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David Thomas Leake
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of David T. Leake
130 West Main Street
Somerset, PA 15501

David.leake.esq@gmail.com
814 445 6946
Party name: Jeffrey Olson
Attorneys for Respondent
Hugh J. Burns Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
1600 Arch Street Suite 300
philadelphia, PA 19103

hburns@attorneygeneral.gov
4843905143
Party name: Pennsylvania