No. 19-107
Title:Vincent Asaro, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:July 22, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-48)
   Decision Date:April 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 21, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Vincent Asaro.
Blanket Consent
Aug 08 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 12 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Vincent Asaro filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Due Process Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 19 2019Response Requested. (Due September 18, 2019)
Sep 10 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 18, 2019 to October 18, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including October 18, 2019.
Sep 18 2019Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 18 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Federal Defenders and FAMM filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 04 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from October 18, 2019 to November 12, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Oct 07 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including November 12, 2019.
Nov 12 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Nov 18 2019Reply of petitioner Vincent Asaro filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 18 2019Letter of Waiver of 14-day Waiting Period of Vincent Asaro submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: Vincent Asaro
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Anton Metlitsky
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers, LLP
Times Square Tower, 7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036

ametlitsky@omm.com
2123262000
Party name: The National Association of Federal Defenders and FAMM
Shana-Tara O'Toole
    Counsel of Record
DUE PROCESS INSTITUTE
700 Pennsylvania Avenue SE #560
Washington, DC 20003

shana@idueprocess.org
2025586683
Party name: Due Process Institute
Jay Remington Schweikert
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20001

jschweikert@cato.org
2022161461
Party name: Cato Institute