No. 19-1069
Title:Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, et al., Petitioners
v.
Painters and Allied Trades District Council 82 Health Care Fund, et al.
Docketed:February 28, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55588)
   Decision Date:December 3, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 26 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, et al.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 30, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 30, 2020.
Mar 27 2020Amicus brief of Washington Legal Foundation submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2020Amicus brief of National Association of Manufacturers and American Tort Reform Association submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Jonathan Saul Franklin
    Counsel of Record
Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP
799 9th Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20001

jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com
2026620466
Party name: Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Brent Wisner
    Counsel of Record
Baum Hedlund Aristei & Goldman, P.C.
10940 Wilshire Boulevard, 17th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90024

rbwisner@baumhedlundlaw.com
3102073233
Party name: Painters and Allied Trades District Council 82 Health Care Fund, et al.
Other
Cory L. Andrews
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
202.588.0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Mark Alan Behrens
    Counsel of Record
SHOOK, HARDY & BACON L.L.P.
1800 K Street, NW, Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20006

mbehrens@shb.com
202-783-8400
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers and American Tort Reform Association