No. 19-1067
Title:Neal N. Browder, et al., Petitioners
v.
S. R. Nehad, et al.
Docketed:February 28, 2020
Linked with 19A677
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-55035)
   Decision Date:July 11, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 2, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2019Application (19A677) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 31, 2019 to January 29, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Dec 17 2019Application (19A677) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 29, 2020.
Jan 16 2020Application (19A677) to extend further the time from January 29, 2020 to February 28, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Written Request
Jan 21 2020Application (19A677) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 28, 2020.
Feb 25 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Waiver of S.R. Nehad, et al. of right to respond submitted.
Main Document
Mar 27 2020Amicus brief of California State Association of Counties and the League of California Cities submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
George Frederick Schaefer
    Counsel of Record
San Diego City Attorney's Office
1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100
San Diego, CA 92101

Gschaefer@sandiego.gov
619-533-5861
Party name: Neal Browder, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jennifer Mira Hashmall
    Counsel of Record
Miller Barondess, LLP
1999 Avenue of the Stars, Suite 1000
Los Angeles, CA 90067

mhashmall@millerbarondess.com
3105524400
Party name: S.R. Nehad, et al.
Other
Lee Harris Roistacher
    Counsel of Record
Daley & Heft, LLP
462 Stevens Avenue, Suite 201
Solana Beach, CA 92075

lroistacher@daleyheft.com
8587555666
Party name: California State Association of Counties and the League of California Cities