No. 19-1066
Title:Comcast Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Charles E. Tillage, et al.
Docketed:February 28, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-15288)
   Decision Date:June 28, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:January 17, 2020
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 27 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 04 2020Letter of March 4, 2020 from counsel for petitioners received.
Mar 09 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Comcast Corporation, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 18 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 30, 2020 to April 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 19 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2020.
Mar 24 2020Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020Brief amicus curiae of CTIA - The Wireless Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Brief amici curiae of American Bankers Association; Consumer Bankers Association filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 27 2020Amicus brief of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark Andrew Perry
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036-5306

mperry@gibsondunn.com
202-887-3667
Party name: Comcast Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Charles Tillage, et al.
Other
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Zach Chaffee-McClure
    Counsel of Record
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
2555 Grand Blvd
Kansas City, MO 64108

zmcclure@shb.com
816-559-2404
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar
Mark Jay Levin
    Counsel of Record
Ballard Spahr LLP
Mellon Bank Center
l735 Market Street - 51st Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

levinm@ballardspahr.com
(215) 665-8500
Party name: American Bankers Association; Consumer Bankers Association
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: CTIA - The Wireless Association