No. 19-1065
Title:Teresa Ann Johnson, Petitioner
v.
Alaska
Docketed:February 28, 2020
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Alaska
   Case Numbers:(A12744)
   Decision Date:October 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:January 29, 2020

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 30, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 27 2020Waiver of State of Alaska of right to respond submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Hari Santhanam
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
300 North LaSalle Street
Chicago, IL 60654

hsanthanam@kirkland.com
3128622000
Party name: Teresa Ann Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Tamara Eve DeLucia
    Counsel of Record
State of Alaska, Office of Criminal Appeals
1031 W. 4th Ave Ste 200
Anchorage, AK 99501

tamara.delucia@alaska.gov
9072696260
Party name: State of Alaska