No. 19-1062
Title:CJ CheilJedang Corp., et al., Petitioners
v.
International Trade Commission, et al.
Docketed:February 26, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1590, 2018-1629)
   Decision Date:August 6, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 25, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Motion of respondents Ajinomoto Co., et al. to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2020 to April 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2020, for all respondents.
Mar 26 2020Amicus brief of R Street Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: CJ CheilJedang Corp., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: International Trade Commission, et al.
Charles Edmund Lipsey
    Counsel of Record
Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP
Two Freedom Square
11955 Freedom Drive
Reston, VA 20190-5675

charles.lipsey@finnegan.com
571-203-2700
Party name: Ajinomoto Co., Inc., Ajinomoto Animal Nutrition North America, Inc.
Other
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute