No. 19-1059
Title:Angela Hamm, et vir, Petitioners
v.
Tennessee
Docketed:February 26, 2020
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Tennessee, Western Division
   Case Numbers:(W2016-01282-SC-R11-CD)
   Decision Date:November 21, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2020 to April 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2020.
Mar 27 2020Amicus brief of The Rutherford Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Ilana Hope Eisenstein
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP (US)
1650 Market Street
Suite 5000
Philadelphia, PA 19109-7300

ilana.eisenstein@dlapiper.com
215-668-9715
Party name: Angela Hamm, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Sarah Keeton Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Tennessee Attorney General
War Memorial Building
301 6th Avenue North
Nashville, TN 37243

Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov
(615) 532-6026
Party name: State of Tennessee
Other
Ethan Haller Townsend
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery LLP
The Nemours Building
1007 N. Orange St.
Wilmington, DE 19801

ehtownsend@mwe.com
302-485-3911
Party name: The Rutherford Institute