No. 19-1058
Vide 19-1061
Title:Hospira, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Eli Lilly and Company
Docketed:February 26, 2020
Linked with 19A841
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-2126, 2018-2127)
   Decision Date:August 9, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 8, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2020Application (19A841) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 6, 2020 to February 24, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 28 2020Application (19A841) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 24, 2020.
Feb 24 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 27, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2020 to April 27, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 27, 2020.
Mar 26 2020Amicus brief of America's Health Insurance Plans submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Amicus brief of R Street Institute submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Adam G. Unikowsky
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue, NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

AUnikowsky@jenner.com
202-639-6041
Party name: Hospira, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam Lawrence Perlman
    Counsel of Record
Latham& Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

adam.perlman@lw.com
2026372200
Party name: Eli Lilly and Company
Other
Charles Duan
    Counsel of Record
R Street Institute
1212 New York Ave NW Suite 900
Washington, DC 20005

cduan@rstreet.org
(202) 525-5717
Party name: R Street Institute
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

annarose.mathieson@calapplaw.com
4156496700
Party name: America's Health Insurance Plans