No. 19-1054 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Christa Gail Pike, Petitioner
v.
Gloria Gross, Warden
Docketed:February 25, 2020
Linked with 19A642
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-5854)
   Decision Date:August 22, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 06 2019Application (19A642) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2019 to February 23, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Application (19A642) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 24, 2020.
Feb 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 26, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Brief of Gloria Gross in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2020Amicus brief of National Association for Public Defense, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Elaine Janet Goldenberg
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street, NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

elaine.goldenberg@mto.com
202-220-1114
Party name: Christa Gail Pike
Attorneys for Respondent
Richard Davison Douglas
    Counsel of Record
State of Tennessee Attorney General
P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202

davey.douglas@ag.tn.gov
615-741-4125
Party name: Gloria Gross
Other
Jennifer Kinsley
    Counsel of Record
Salmon P. Chase College of Law
Nunn Hall, Nunn Drive
Highland Heights, KY 41099

kinsleylawoffice@gmail.com
859-572-7998
Party name: National Association for Public Defense, et al.