No. 19-1052
Title:Andre G. Dewberry, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 24, 2020
Linked with 19A622
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1649)
   Decision Date:August 27, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 2, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 02 2019Application (19A622) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 31, 2019 to February 14, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 04 2019Application (19A622) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until January 30, 2020.
Jan 10 2020Application (19A622) to extend further the time from January 30, 2020 to February 20, 2020, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Written RequestProof of Service
Jan 14 2020Application (19A622) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until February 20, 2020.
Feb 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2020 to April 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 17 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 12th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Andre Dewberry
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States