No. 19-1051
Title:Kansas, Petitioner
v.
Timothy C. Boettger
Docketed:February 24, 2020
Linked with 19A697, 19A698
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kansas
   Case Numbers:(115,387)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2019
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 17 2019Application (19A697) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2020 to February 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 17 2019Application (19A698) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 23, 2020 to February 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 26 2019Application (19A698) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 24, 2020.
Dec 26 2019Application (19A697) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until February 24, 2020.
Feb 20 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 25, 2020 to April 24, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 24, 2020.
Mar 25 2020Amicus brief of Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 25 2020Amicus brief of Virginia, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Toby Crouse
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General Derek Schmidt
120 S.W. 10th Avenue
2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

toby.crouse@ag.ks.gov
785.368.6693
Party name: State of Kansas
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey T. Green
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Timothy C. Boettger, et al.
Other
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Virginia, et al.
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2001 Ross Avenue
Suite 2100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: Kansas Coalition Against Sexual and Domestic Violence, et al.