No. 19-1046
Title:Matthew T. Albence, et al., Petitioners
v.
Ravidath Lawrence Ragbir, et al.
Docketed:February 24, 2020
Linked with 19A673
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-1597)
   Decision Date:April 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 26, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2019Application (19A673) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 25, 2019 to January 24, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Dec 13 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Dec 17 2019Application (19A673) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until January 24, 2020.
Jan 14 2020Application (19A673) to extend further the time from January 24, 2020 to February 21, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Jan 14 2020Application (19A673) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 21, 2020.
Feb 21 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 25, 2020)
Mar 25 2020Waiver of right of respondent Ravidath L. Ragbir to respond filed.
Apr 01 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 06 2020Response Requested. (Due May 6, 2020)
Apr 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 6, 2020 to July 6, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Apr 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. FranciscoSolicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Matthew T. Albence, Dir. of U.S. Immigration
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert Stanton Jones
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP
601 Massachusetts Ave, NW
Washington, DC 20001

Stanton.Jones@arnoldporter.com
202-942-5563
Party name: Ravidath L. Ragbir