No. 19-1042
Vide 19-889
Title:Euince J. Winzer, Individually and on Behalf of the Statutory Beneficiaries of Gabriel A. Winzer, Petitioner
v.
Kaufman County, Texas, et al.
Docketed:February 21, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-11482)
   Decision Date:February 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 21, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent Kaufman County, Texas, Matthew Hind to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Mar 31 2020Response Requested. (Due April 30, 2020)
Apr 22 2020Brief of respondents Kaufman County, Texas, Matthew Hind in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
May 19 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/4/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Matthew Joseph Kita
    Counsel of Record
P.O. Box 5119
Dallas, TX 75208

matt@mattkita.com
214-699-1863
Party name: Eunice J. Winzer
Attorneys for Respondents
Stephen Cass Weiland
    Counsel of Record
Patton Boggs LLP
2000 McKinney Avenue, Suite 1700
Dallas, TX 75201

cass.weiland@squirepb.com
214 758 1504
Party name: Kaufman County, Texas, Matthew Hind