No. 19-1039
Title:PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC, Petitioner
v.
New Jersey, et al.
Docketed:February 20, 2020
Linked with 19A836
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-1191, 19-1232)
   Decision Date:September 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 5, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 24 2020Application (19A836) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from February 3, 2020 to March 4, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Application (19A836) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until March 4, 2020.
Feb 18 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 09 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC.
Blanket Consent
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Marcellus Shale Coalition and Pennsylvania Independent Oil & Gas Association filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Industrial Energy Consumers of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Pennslvania Manufacturers' Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amici curiae of United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al. filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Waiver of New Jersey Conservation Foundation of right to respond not accepted for filing. (March 24, 2020)
Mar 23 2020Waiver of right of respondent New Jersey Conservation Foundation to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Consumer Energy Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amicus curiae of Energy Equipment and Infrastructure Alliance filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amici curiae of Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, American Gas Association, American Petroleum Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2020Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: PennEast Pipeline Company, LLC
Attorneys for Respondents
Edward Lloyd
    Counsel of Record
Morningside Heights Legal Services, Inc.
Columbia Law School
435 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027

elloyd@law.columbia.edu
9734953774
Party name: New Jersey Conservation Foundation
Other
Ellen O. Boardman
    Counsel of Record
O'Donoghue & O'Donoghue LLP
5301 Wisconsin Ave, NW
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20015

eboardman@odonoghuelaw.com
2023620041
Party name: United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipe Fitting Industry of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO, et al.
Charles Owen Beckley II
    Counsel of Record
Beckley & Madden, LLC
212 North Third Street, Suite 301
Harrisburg, PA 17101

cbeckley@pa.net
(717) 233-7691
Party name: Pennslvania Manufacturers' Association and the New Jersey Business & Industry Association
Terry Robert Bossert
    Counsel of Record
Marcellus Shale Coalition
300 N. 2nd St.
Suite 1102
Harrisburg, PA 17101

tbossert@marcelluscoalition.org
717-603-0714
Party name: Marcellus Shale Coalition and Pennsylvania Independent Oil & Gas Association
Lela M. Hollabaugh
    Counsel of Record
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
1600 Division Street
Nashville, TN 37203

lhollabaugh@bradley.com
615-252-2348
Party name: Interstate Natural Gas Association of America, American Gas Association, American Petroleum Institute
Deanne Elizabeth Maynard
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

dmaynard@mofo.com
202-887-8740
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America and the Pennsylvania Chamber of Business and Industry
Michael Hugh McGinley
    Counsel of Record
Dechert LLP
1900 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

michael.mcginley@dechert.com
202-261-3378
Party name: Energy Equipment and Infrastructure Alliance
Hala A. Sandridge
    Counsel of Record
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
401 East Jackson Street
Suite 2400
Tampa, FL 33602

hala.sandridge@bipc.com
8132221127
Party name: Consumer Energy Alliance
Catherine Emily Stetson
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20004-1109

cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
2026375491
Party name: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Kenneth Von Schaumburg
    Counsel of Record
Clark Hill PLC
1001 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Suite 1300 South
Washington, DC 20004

kvonschaumburg@clarkhill.com
(202)403-9604
Party name: Industrial Energy Consumers of America