No. 19-1037
Title:Sok Bun, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 19, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-4270)
   Decision Date:December 16, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 20, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: Sok Bun
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States