No. 19-1035
Title:ShaRon D. Rose, Petitioner
v.
Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., et al.
Docketed:February 20, 2020
Linked with 19A741
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-50598)
   Decision Date:December 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 31 2019Application (19A741) for a stay, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Jan 03 2020Application (19A741) denied by Justice Alito.
Feb 19 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 23, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: ShaRon D. Rose