No. 19-1033
Title:Daniel Enrique Cantú, Petitioner
v.
James M. Moody, et al.
Docketed:February 19, 2020
Linked with 19A731
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-40434)
   Decision Date:August 5, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 30 2019Application (19A731) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 16, 2020 to February 14, 2020, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 31 2019Application (19A731) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 14, 2020.
Feb 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 20, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 23 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 20, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
McDermott Will & Emery
500 North Capitol Street, NW
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Daniel Enrique Cantú
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States