No. 19-1031
Title:Erin Capron, et al., Petitioners
v.
Office of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, et al.
Docketed:February 19, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-2140)
   Decision Date:December 2, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 28 2020Waiver of right of respondent Office of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 04 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/20/2020.
Mar 17 2020Response Requested. (Due April 16, 2020)
Mar 17 2020Brief amicus curiae of The Alliance for International Exchange filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 19 2020Letter of March 17, 2020 from counsel for petitioners received.
Main Document
Mar 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 16, 2020 to May 18, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2020.
Apr 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Current and Former Au Pairs filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Host Families filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2020Brief of respondents Office of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 02 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/18/2020.
Jun 02 2020Reply of Erin Capron, et al. submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

paul.clement@kirkland.com
2023895000
Party name: Erin Capron, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Robert E. Toone Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Massachusetts Attorney General
One Ashburton Place
Boston, MA 02108

Robert.Toone@mass.gov
6179632178
Party name: Office of the Attorney General of the Commonwealth of Massachusetts, et al.
Other
Leslie Anne Benitez
    Counsel of Record
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LP
816 Congress Avenue, Suite 1510
Austin, TX 78701

lbenitez@grsm.com
512-391-0197
Party name: The Alliance for International Exchange
Mark Simon Davies
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Columbia Center
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

mark.davies@orrick.com
202-339-8631
Party name: Current and Former Au Pairs
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Host Families