No. 19-1029
Title:Bethany Austin, Petitioner
v.
Illinois
Docketed:February 19, 2020
Linked with 19A777
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Illinois
   Case Numbers:(123910)
   Decision Date:October 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 10 2020Application (19A777) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 16, 2020 to February 14, 2020, submitted to Justice Kavanaugh.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Jan 14 2020Application (19A777) granted by Justice Kavanaugh extending the time to file until February 14, 2020.
Feb 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 20, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 04 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Bethany Austin.
Blanket Consent
Mar 19 2020Waiver of right of respondent Illinois to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 19 2020Brief amici curiae of American Booksellers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Letter of Bethany Austin not accepted for filing. (March 20, 2020 - Corrected version to be submitted)
Mar 20 2020Letter of petitioner Bethany Austin received.
Main Document
Mar 20 2020Brief amici curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Brief amici curiae of First Amendment Lawyers Association and the Marion B. Brechner First Amendment Project filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Woodhull Freedom Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 25 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/17/2020.
Apr 02 2020Response Requested. (Due May 4, 2020)
Apr 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 4, 2020 to July 3, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 27 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 6, 2020. See Rule 30.1.
Jul 06 2020Brief of respondent State of Illinois in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 22 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/29/2020.
Jul 27 2020Reply of petitioner Bethany Austin filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert Lawrence Corn-Revere
    Counsel of Record
Davis Wright Tremaine, LLP
1919 Pennsylvania Ave., NW,
Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

bobcornrevere@dwt.com
202-973-4225
Party name: Bethany Austin
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Marc Glick
    Counsel of Record
Illinois Attorney General's Office
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

mglick@atg.state.il.us
3128142232
Party name: Illinois
Jane Elinor Notz
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General, State of Illinois
100 West Randolph Street, 12th Floor
Chicago, IL 60601

jnotz@atg.state.il.us
312-814-5376
Party name: State of Illinois
Other
Michael A Bamberger
    Counsel of Record
Dentons US LLP
1221 Avenue of the Americas,
New York, NY 10020

michael.bamberger@dentons.com
212 768-6756
Party name: American Booksellers Association, The Association of American Publishers, Inc., Authors Guild, Inc., Comic Book Legal Defense Fund, Freedom to Read Foundation, Media Coalition Foundation, Inc., and National Press Photographers Association,
Mark William Bennett
    Counsel of Record
Bennett & Bennett
917 Franklin Street, Fourth Floor
Houston, TX 77002

mb@ivi3.com
7132241747
Party name: First Amendment Lawyers Association and the Marion B. Brechner First Amendment Project
Samuel Bracken Gedge
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road, Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

sgedge@ij.org
(703) 682-9320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
2028420200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Lawrence G. Walters
    Counsel of Record
Walters Law Group
195 W. Pine Avenue
Longwood, FL 32750

paralegal@firstamendment.com
4079759150
Party name: Woodhull Freedom Foundation