No. 19-1026
Title:Ford Motor Company, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 18, 2020
Linked with 19A574
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2018-1018)
   Decision Date:June 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2019Application (19A574) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 14, 2020 to February 13, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 21 2019Application (19A574) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 13, 2020.
Feb 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner Ford Motor Company.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Mar 13 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 16 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 20, 2020.
Mar 19 2020Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2020Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Association of Exporters and Importers.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 19 2020Brief amicus curiae of Customs and International Trade Bar Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Peter D. Keisler
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

pkeisler@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8027
Party name: Ford Motor Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
John M. Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Neville Peterson LLP
55 Broadway
New York, NY 10006

jpeterson@npwny.com
2126252730
Party name: American Association of Exporters and Importers
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: The National Association of Manufacturers and the Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Matthew Robert Nicely
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP
1775 I Street, NW
Washington, DC 20036

matthew.nicely@hugheshubbard.com
202-729-4750
Party name: Curiae Customs and International Trade Bar Association