No. 19-1023
Vide 19-8117
Title:Donnie Morgan, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Vincent D. White, Jr.
Docketed:February 18, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-3277)
   Decision Date:October 8, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 20, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 13 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Vincent D. White, Jr.
Blanket Consent
Mar 19 2020Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Benjamin Michael Flowers
    Counsel of Record
Ohio Attorney General Dave Yost
30 E. Broad St.
Columbus, OH 43215

benjamin.flowers@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
6144668980
Party name: Warden, Ross Correctional Institution
Attorneys for Respondent
Charles Mark Pickrell
    Counsel of Record
5701 Old Harding Pike
Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37205

mark.pickrell@pickrell.net
6153569316
Party name: Vincent White
Other
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Indiana AG's Office, IGC S., 5th Fl.
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana