No. 19-1022
Title:Gerard Patrick Matthews, Petitioner
v.
William P. Barr, Attorney General
Docketed:February 18, 2020
Linked with 19A439
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3145)
   Decision Date:June 18, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:September 18, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 21 2019Application (19A439) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 17, 2019 to February 14, 2020, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Oct 21 2019Pursuant to Rule 34.6 and Paragraph 9 of the Guidelines for the Submission of Documents to the Supreme Court's Electronic Filing System, filings in this case should be submitted in paper form only, and should not be submitted through the Court's electronic filing system.
Oct 22 2019Application (19A439) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until February 14, 2020.
Feb 14 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 19, 2020)
Mar 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 19, 2020 to April 20, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Mar 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 20, 2020.
Mar 19 2020Brief amici curiae of The American Immigration Lawyers Association, et al. filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David J. ZimmerGoodwin Proctor LLP
100 Northern Ave.
Boston, MA 02210

dzimmer@goodwinlaw.com
(617) 570-1000
Party name: Gerard Matthews
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Barr, William
Other
Eric F. Citron
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russell, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

ecitron@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: The American Immigration Lawyers Association, Her Justice, the Neighborhood Defender Service of Harlem, and Sanctuary for Families