No. 19-1012
Title:General Electric Company, Petitioner
v.
United Technologies Corporation
Docketed:February 14, 2020
Linked with 19A727
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2017-2497)
   Decision Date:July 10, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:October 15, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 31 2019Application (19A727) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 13, 2020 to February 12, 2020, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 06 2020Application (19A727) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until February 12, 2020.
Feb 12 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2020)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2020 to April 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2020.
Mar 16 2020Brief amicus curiae of Frontier Communications Corporation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2020Brief amici curiae of Unified Patents, LLC; Engine Advocacy; Cable Television Laboratories, Inc.; The R Street Institute; and The Niskanen Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2200
Party name: General Electric Company
Attorneys for Respondent
Taylor Ann Rausch Meehan
    Counsel of Record
Bartlit Beck LLP
54 W. Hubbard St. Ste. 300
Chicago, IL 60654

taylor.meehan@bartlit-beck.com
3124944416
Party name: United Technologies Corporation
Other
Ruthanne Mary Deutsch
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt, PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

rdeutsch@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Unified Patents, LLC; Engine Advocacy; Cable Television Laboratories, Inc.; The R Street Institute; and The Niskanen Center
Paul R. Garcia
    Counsel of Record
401 Merritt Seven
Norwalk, CT 06851

Paul.Garcia@ftr.com
203-614-5214
Party name: Frontier Communications Corporation