No. 19-1009
Title:Altera Corporation & Subsidiaries, Petitioner
v.
Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Docketed:February 13, 2020
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-70496, 16-70497)
   Decision Date:June 7, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:November 12, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 10 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 16, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2020Brief amici curiae of National Association of Manufacturers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 10 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 16, 2020 to April 15, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 11 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 15, 2020.
Mar 12 2020Brief amici curiae of Cisco Systems, Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 13 2020Brief amici curiae of Former Foreign Tax Officials filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2020Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 16 2020Brief amici curiae of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nicole A. Saharsky
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

nsaharsky@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: Altera Corporation & Subsidiaries
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Commissioner of Internal Revenue
Other
Carter G. Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
1501 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

cphillips@sidley.com
+1 202 736 8270
Party name: National Association of Manufacturers, et al.
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Former Foreign Tax Officials
David B. Salmons
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20004

david.salmons@morganlewis.com
(202) 739-3000
Party name: Cisco Systems, Inc., et al.
Melissa Arbus Sherry
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 Eleventh Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

melissa.sherry@lw.com
202-637-3386
Party name: PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, et al.
Christopher Jay Walker
    Counsel of Record
Michael E Moritz College of Law
469 Drinko Hall
55 West 12th Ave
Columbus, OH 43210

christopher.j.walker@gmail.com
614-247-1898
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America