No. 19-1006
Title:Facebook, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Superior Court of California, San Francisco County, et al.
Docketed:February 11, 2020
Linked with 19A609
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of California, First Appellate District
   Case Numbers:(A157902)
   Decision Date:July 30, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:September 11, 2019

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 26 2019Application (19A609) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 10, 2019 to February 8, 2020, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Dec 02 2019Application (19A609) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until February 8, 2020.
Feb 07 2020Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 12, 2020)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 20 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2020 to April 13, 2020, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 24 2020Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Joshua Seth Lipshutz
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

jlipshutz@gibsondunn.com
202-955-8217
Party name: Facebook, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Stuart Banner
    Counsel of Record
UCLA School of Law Supreme Court Clinic
405 Hilgard Ave.
Los Angeles, CA 90095

banner@law.ucla.edu
3102068506
Party name: Lee Sullivan