No. 18-981 | |
Title: | Theresa Jones, et al., Petitioners v. United States |
Docketed: | January 29, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (17-55234) |
Decision Date: | August 9, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 16, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 09 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2019) |
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | |
Feb 22 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 28, 2019 to April 1, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 25 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 1, 2019. |
Apr 01 2019 | Brief of respondent United States of America in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Apr 17 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019. |
May 08 2019 | Rescheduled. |
May 13 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019. |
May 20 2019 | Petition DENIED. Justice Thomas, dissenting from the denial of certiorari: I dissent for the reasons set out in Daniel v. United States, 587 U. S. ___ (2019) (Thomas, J., dissenting from denial of certiorari). |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Brian Joseph Lawler Counsel of Record | Pilot Law, P.C. 850 Beech Street Suite 713 San Diego, CA 92101 blawler@pilotlawcorp.com | 619-255-2398 |
Party name: Theresa Jones, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: United States of America |