No. 18-9674 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Terence Tramaine Andrus, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:June 14, 2019
Linked with 18A1011
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(WR-84,438-01)
   Decision Date:February 13, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 29 2019Application (18A1011) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 14, 2019 to July 12, 2019, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main Document
Apr 03 2019Application (18A1011) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until June 13, 2019.
Jun 12 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 15, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 12 2019Brief amici curiae of James S. Brady, Kendall Coffey, Michael Dettmer, W. Thomas Dillard, Terry Pechota, David Shapiro, and John Smietanka filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 12 2019Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 19 2019Reply of petitioner Terence Andrus filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Aug 14 2019Record Requested.
Oct 04 2019Record received from the Texas Court of Criminal Appeals. The record is electronic.
Oct 10 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Oct 16 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 06 2019Rescheduled.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Dec 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Gretchen S. Sween
    Counsel of Record
Sween Law
PO Box 5083
Austin, TX 78763-5083

gsweenlaw@gmail.com
214.557.5779
Party name: Terence Andrus
Attorneys for Respondent
Charann Ellesse Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Fort Bend County District Attorney's Office
301 Jackson Street
Richmond, TX 77469

charann.thompson@fortbendcountytx.gov
281-341-4460
Party name: Texas
Other
Michael T. Brody
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 N. Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

MBrody@jenner.com
312-923-2711
Party name: James S. Brady, Kendall Coffey, Michael Dettmer, W. Thomas Dillard, Terry Pechota, David Shapiro, and John Smietanka