No. 18-966
Title:Department of Commerce, et al., Petitioners
v.
New York, et al.
Docketed:January 25, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(19-212)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 25 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment filed. (Response due February 25, 2019)
PetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jan 25 2019Motion to expedite consideration of the petition for a writ of certiorari filed by petitioners.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Response to petitioners' motion to expedite from respondents New York, et al. (Government Plaintiffs-Respondents) filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 30 2019Motion DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 11 2019Brief of respondents New York et al. (Government Plaintiffs-Respondents) in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amici curiae of Ronald A. Cass & Christopher C. DeMuth, Sr. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief of respondents New York Immigration Coalition, et al. in opposition filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch and AEF filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2019Brief amicus curiae of Project on Fair Representation filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2019Reply of petitioners Department of Commerce, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari before judgment GRANTED. The case will be set for argument in the second week of the April argument session.
Feb 19 2019Joint letter of the parties proposing briefing schedule filed.
Main Document
Feb 21 2019Petitioner's brief on the merits, and any amicus curiae briefs in support of petitioners or in support of neither party, are to be filed on or before Wednesday, March 6, 2019. Respondents' briefs on the merits, and any amicus curiae briefs in support of respondents, are to be filed on or before Monday, April 1, 2019. The reply brief on the merits is to be filed in accordance with Rule 25.3 of the Rules of this Court.
Feb 22 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 23, 2019 (10 a.m.).
Feb 25 2019Letter of petitioners filed.
Main Document
Feb 27 2019Blanket Consent filed by respondents New York, et al. (government respondents).
Blanket Consent
Feb 27 2019Blanket Consent filed by respondents New York Immigration Coalition, et al.
Blanket Consent
Mar 04 2019Motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Joint appendix of petitioners filed (Volume 1).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief of petitioners Department of Commerce, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Ronald A. Cass & Christopher C. DeMuth, Sr. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Oklahoma, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Project on Fair Representation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Republican National Committee and the National Republican Congressional Committee filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Citizens United, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 08 2019Joint motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument, and response to motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed by respondents New York et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 11 2019Letter of petitioners updating Court on related case filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 13 2019Joint letter of respondents in response to letter of Solicitor General filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Mar 15 2019The parties are directed to brief and argue the following additional question: Whether the Secretary of Commerce’s decision to add a citizenship question to the Decennial Census violated the Enumeration Clause of the U.S. Constitution, art. I, §2, cl. 3. Respondents are allowed an additional 2,000 words in aggregate to address this question in their briefs on the merits. Petitioners are allowed an additional 1,000 words to address this question in their reply brief on the merits.
Mar 20 2019CIRCULATED
Mar 20 2019Blanket consent filed by petitioners.
Blanket Consent
Mar 21 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 2nd Circuit.
Mar 26 2019Brief amici curiae of The KIPP Foundation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2019Record received from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York. The record is Sealed. (One Envelope).
Mar 29 2019Brief amici curiae of The National School Boards Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Joint appendix of respondents filed (Volumes 2, 3 & 4). (Distributed)
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain DocumentProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief of respondents New York, et al. (Government Plaintiffs-Respondents) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief of respondents New York Immigration Coalition, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Businesses and Business Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Natural Resources Defense Council filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Norman Y. Mineta, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Certificate of Service filed with respect to brief of amicus curiae of Arab American Institute.
Proof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of State of California filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Current Members of Congress and Bipartisan Former Members of Congress filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2019Proof of Service filed with respect to brief of amici Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC), et al..
Main Document
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Plaintiffs in Kravitz et al. v. United States Department of Commerce et al., No. 18-1041 (D.MD) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of American Statistical Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Nielsen Company (US), LLC filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States House of Representatives filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of The Catholic Charities of the Archdiocese of New York, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of Arab American Institute filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Council of the Great City Schools filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Harris County, Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of The Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Lawyers for Civil Rights, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of 190 Bipartisan Elected Officials, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Census Bureau Directors filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Foundations and Philanthropy-Serving Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Federal District Judges filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of National Asian Pacific Bar Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association (IMLA) and the International City/County Management Association (ICMA) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of County of Santa Clara, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Central Valley Immigrant Integration Collaborative, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Legal Services NYC, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of John R. Dunne, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Common Cause, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Historians and Social Scientists Margo Anderson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of City of San Jose and the Black Alliance for Just Immigration filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of Nicholas Bagley, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of National Council of Nonprofits, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amicus curiae of California Legislature filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 01 2019Brief amici curiae of LatinoJustice PRLDEF, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 12 2019Motion of United States House of Representatives for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Apr 12 2019Joint motion for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed by respondents GRANTED in part and the time is divided as follows: 40 minutes for petitioners, 20 minutes for respondents New York, et al., 10 minutes for respondents New York Immigration Coalition, et al., and 10 minutes for amicus curiae United States House of Representatives.
Apr 16 2019Reply of petitioners Department of Commerce, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Department of Commerce, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Dale E. Ho
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union
125 Broad Street
Director, Voting Rights Project
New York, NY 10004

dale.ho@aclu.org
212-549-2693
Party name: New York Immigration Coalition, et al.
Barbara Dale Underwood
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Attorney General
28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005-1400

Barbara.underwood@ag.ny.gov
212-416-8016
Party name: New York et al. (Government Plaintiffs-Respondents)
Other
Robert Alan Atkins
    Counsel of Record
Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP
1285 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

ratkins@paulweiss.com
212-373-3000
Party name: 190 Bipartisan Elected Officials, et al.
William Spencer Consovoy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

will@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: Project on Fair Representation
Charles Timothy Delaney
    Counsel of Record
National Council of Nonprofits
1001 G St NW Ste 700E
Washington, DC 85004-0000

TDELANEY@COUNCILOFNONPROFITS.ORG
2029620322
Party name: National Council of Nonprofits, et al.
Stuart Frank Delery
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave. NW
Washington, DC 20036

SDelery@gibsondunn.com
(202) 887-3650
Party name: Businesses and Business Organizations
Gregory L. Diskant
    Counsel of Record
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler, LLP
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036

gldiskant@pbwt.com
(212) 336-2000
Party name: Common Cause, Trevor Potter, Rep. Jody L. McNally, Justice Robert Orr (Ret.), Gil Ontai, and Peter Yao
P. Benjamin DeWitt Duke
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling
620 8th Ave
New York, NY 10018

pbduke@cov.com
212 8411000
Party name: Plaintiffs in Kravitz et al. v. United States Department of Commerce et al.
Ian Michael Fein
    Counsel of Record
Natural Resources Defense Council
111 Sutter Street, 21st Floor
San Francisco, CA 94104

ifein@nrdc.org
4158756147
Party name: Natural Resources Defense Council
Ira M. Feinberg
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

ira.feinberg@hoganlovells.com
(212)-918-3509
Party name: American Statistical Association, et al.
Edward A. Friedman
    Counsel of Record
Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP
7 Times Square
New York, NY 10036-6516

efriedman@fklaw.com
212-833-1100
Party name: Foundations and Philanthropy-Serving Organizations
Albert Quoc Giang
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
725 S. Figueroa Street
31st Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90017

agiang@bsfllp.com
2136299040
Party name: National Asian Pacific American Bar Association, Asian American Legal Defense and Education Fund, et al.
Danielle Luce Goldstein
    Counsel of Record
Office of the County Counsel, County of Santa Clara
70 W. Hedding Street, East Wing, 9th Floor
San Jose, CA 95110

danielle.goldstein@cco.sccgov.org
4082995906
Party name: County of Santa Clara
Derek T. Ho
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

dho@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7931
Party name: Former Federal District Judges
Yalonda Taliss Howze
    Counsel of Record
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo, P.C.
One Financial Center
Boston, MA 02111

ythowze@mintz.com
6173481813
Party name: Lawyers for Civil Rights et al.
Robin B. Johansen
    Counsel of Record
Remcho Johansen & Purcell LL P
1901 Harrison Street, Suite 1550
Oakland, CA 94612

courtfilings@rjp.com
510-346-6200
Party name: California Legislature
Eamon Paul Joyce
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin LLP
787 Seventh Avenue
New York, NY 10019

ejoyce@sidley.com
(212) 839-5300
Party name: The Catholic Charities of the Archdiocese of New York, et al.
John J. Korzen
    Counsel of Record
Anderson Korzen & Associates
WAKE FOREST UNIVERSITY SCHOOL OF LAW APPELLATE ADVOCACY CLINIC
Post Office Box 7206
Winston-Salem,, NC 27109

korzenjj@wfu.edu
3367585832
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association (IMLA) and the International City/County Management Association (ICMA)
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 5th Ave, Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Nicholas Bagley, Michael Dorf, Aziz Huq, Leah Litman, Gillian Metzger, Jon D. Michaels, Laurence H. Tribe, and Stephen I. Vladeck
Michael James Mongan
    Counsel of Record
State of CA, Department of Justice
455 Golden Gate Ave., Suite 11000
San Francisco, CA 94102

michael.mongan@doj.ca.gov
(415) 510-3920
Party name: State of California
Ernesto Rafael Palomo
    Counsel of Record
Locke Lord LLP
111 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

epalomo@lockelord.com
3124430477
Party name: LatinoJustice PRLDEF and Fifteen Other Organizations
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Former Census Bureau Directors
Marc Rotenberg
    Counsel of Record
Electronic Privacy Information Center (EPIC)
1718 Connecticut Ave., NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20009

rotenberg@epic.org
202-415-6788
Party name: Electronic Privacy Information Center, et al.
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212) 230-8800
Party name: Leadership Conference on Civil and Human Rights, et. al.
Gideon Alexander Schor
    Counsel of Record
Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC
1301 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10019

gschor@wsgr.com
(212) 999-5800
Party name: Legal Services NYC, et al.
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 02109

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4000
Party name: Norman Y. Mineta, The Sakamoto Sisters, The Council on American-Islamic Relations (National and New York, Inc.), and The Fred T. Korematsu Center for Law and Equality
Brian Adair Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Reed Smith, LLP
101 2nd Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

bsutherland@reedsmith.com
4156594843
Party name: Historians and Social Scientists Margo Anderson et al.
David Jacob Zimmer
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter LLP
100 Northern Ave.
Boston, MA 02210

dzimmer@goodwinlaw.com
6175701000
Party name: NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc.
Deborah N. Archer
    Counsel of Record
New York University School of Law
245 Sullivan St.
Rm. 610
New York, NY 10012

deborah.archer@nyu.edu
2129986528
Party name: The KIPP Foundation; Advocates for Children of New York; New Jersey Institute for Social Justice; UnidosUS
Samuel Robert Bagenstos
    Counsel of Record
625 S. State St.
Ann Arbor, MI 48109

sbagen@gmail.com
857-231-1663
Party name: John R. Dunne et al.
Eric S. Baxter
    Counsel of Record
The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
1200 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Ste. 700
Washington, DC 20036

ebaxter@becketlaw.org
(202) 955-0095
Party name: The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty
Jason Carey Beekman
    Counsel of Record
ESQelate LLC
14610 Rolling Green Way
North Potomac, MD 20878

Jason.Beekman@ESQelate.com
301-529-8151
Party name: Arab American Institute
Ishan Kharshedji Bhabha
    Counsel of Record
Jenner and Block LLP
1099 New York Ave NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IBhabha@jenner.com
202-637-6327
Party name: The Nielsen Company (US), LLC
John W. Borkowski
    Counsel of Record
Husch Blackwell
120 South Riverside Plaza, Suite 2200
Chicago, IL 60606

john.borkowski@huschblackwell.com
312-655-1500
Party name: The Council of The Great City Schools
Richard P. Bress
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

rick.bress@lw.com
202-637-2137
Party name: The National School Boards Association et al.
Ronald Andrew Cass
    Counsel of Record
Cass & Associates, PC
10560 Fox Forest Drive
Great Falls, VA 22066

roncass@cassassociates.net
703-438-7590
Party name: Ronald A. Cass & Christopher C. DeMuth, Sr.
Nicholas David Espiritu
    Counsel of Record
NATIONAL IMMIGRATION LAW CENTER
3450 Wilshire Blvd., #108-62
Los Angeles, CA 90010

espiritu@nilc.org
213--639-3900
Party name: Central Valley Immigrant Integration Collaborative, et al.
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Current Members of Congress and Bipartisan Former Members of Congress
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Susan Hays
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Susan Hays, P.C.
P.O. Box 41647
Austin, TX 78704

hayslaw@me.com
214-557-4819
Party name: Harris County, Texas, Fort Bend County Judge KP George, in his individual capacity, and the City of Marfa, Texas
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Suite 700-1A
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
2023559452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Douglas Neal Letter
    Counsel of Record
Office of General Counsel, U.S. House of Representatives
219 Cannon House Office Building
Washington, DC 20515

douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
202-225-9700
Party name: United States House of Representatives
John F. Libby
    Counsel of Record
Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP
11355 West Olympic Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90064

jlibby@manatt.com
3103124342
Party name: City of San Jose; Black Alliance for Just Immigration
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: State of Oklahoma
William Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Ave. W., Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180

wjo@mindspring.com
7033565070
Party name: Citizens United, et al.
Kaylan Lytle Phillips
    Counsel of Record
Public Interest Legal Foundation
32 E. Washington, Suite 1675
Indianapolis,, IN 46204

kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
3172035599
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation
Robert D. Popper
    Counsel of Record
Judicial Watch, Inc.
425 Third Street, SW
Washington, DC 20024

rpopper@judicialwatch.org
202-646-5172
Party name: Judicial Watch and AEF
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Republican National Committee and National Republican Congressional Committee