No. 18-96
Title:Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association, Petitioner
v.
Clayton Byrd, Executive Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission, et al.
Docketed:July 20, 2018
Linked with 17A1186
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5552)
   Decision Date:February 21, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 24 2018Application (17A1186) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 22, 2018 to July 21, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Apr 26 2018Application (17A1186) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 21, 2018.
Jul 20 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Waiver of right of respondent Clayton Byrd, Executive Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission to respond filed.
Main Document
Aug 16 2018Brief of respondent Tennessee Fine Wines and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine Spirits Beer & More in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Waiver of right of respondent Affleure Investments, Inc. to respond filed.
Main Document
Sep 04 2018Reply of petitioner Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 27 2018Petition GRANTED.
Oct 12 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association.
Blanket Consent
Oct 16 2018Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Tennessee Fine Wines and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine Spirits Beer & More submitted.
Blanket Consent

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shay Dvoretzky
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

sdvoretzky@jonesday.com
2028793474
Party name: Tennessee Wine and Spirits Retailers Association
Attorneys for Respondents
Sarah Keeton Campbell
    Counsel of Record
Special Assistant to the Solicitor General and the Attorney General
War Memorial Building
301 6th Avenue North
Nashville, TN 37243

Sarah.Campbell@ag.tn.gov
(615) 532-6026
Party name: Clayton Byrd, Executive Director of the Tennessee Alcoholic Beverage Commission
Keith Cameron Dennen
    Counsel of Record
Farris Bobango PLC
414 Union St., Suite 1105
Nashville, TN 37219

kdennen@farris-law.com
6156874222
Party name: Affleure Investments, Inc.
William James Murphy
    Counsel of Record
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
100 East Pratt Street
Suite 2440
Baltimore, MD 21202

wmurphy@zuckerman.com
410-332-0444
Party name: Tennessee Fine Wines and Spirits, LLC, dba Total Wine Spirits Beer & More