No. 18-957 | |
Title: | NextEra Energy, Inc., Petitioner v. Elliott Associates, L.P., et al. |
Docketed: | January 24, 2019 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-1109) |
Decision Date: | September 13, 2018 |
Rehearing Denied: | October 24, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Jan 18 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 25, 2019) |
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 06 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 25, 2019 to March 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main Document | |
Feb 12 2019 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2019, for all respondents. |
Feb 21 2019 | Brief amici curiae of National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceOtherOther | |
Mar 27 2019 | Brief of respondents Elliott Associates, L.P., et al. in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Apr 09 2019 | Reply of petitioner NextEra Energy, Inc. filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count | |
Apr 10 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/26/2019. |
Apr 29 2019 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Jonathan Saul Franklin Counsel of Record | Norton Rose Fulbright US LLP 799 9th Street NW Suite 1000 Washington, DC 20001 jonathan.franklin@nortonrosefulbright.com | 2026620466 |
Party name: NextEra Energy, Inc. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier Counsel of Record | Ropes & Gray, LLP 2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20006-6807 Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com | 202-508-4776 |
Party name: Elliott Associates, L.P., Elliott International, L.P., and the Liverpool Limited Partnership | ||
Erin E. Murphy Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 1301 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20004 erin.murphy@kirkland.com | 2023895000 |
Party name: Energy Futures Holdings Corp. | ||
Other | ||
Jonathan S. Massey Counsel of Record | Massey & Gail LLP 1000 Maine Avenue SW Suite 450 Washington, DC 20024 jmassey@masseygail.com | 202-652-4511 |
Party name: National Association of Bankruptcy Trustees |