No. 18-9526
Title:Jimcy McGirt, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:June 7, 2019
Linked with 19A861
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PC-2018-1057)
   Decision Date:February 25, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 17 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 8, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jul 08 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jimcy McGirt.
Blanket Consent
Jul 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 19 2019Response Requested. (Due August 19, 2019)
Aug 19 2019Brief of respondent Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Sep 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.
Nov 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019.
Dec 02 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/6/2019.
Dec 09 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/13/2019.
Dec 13 2019Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Dec 13 2019Letter regarding appearance of counsel filed.
Main Document
Dec 16 2019Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Jimcy McGirt.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 03 2020Motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jan 07 2020Motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including February 4, 2020. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including March 13, 2020.
Jan 08 2020Motion to appoint counsel DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/24/2020.
Jan 17 2020Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Jimcy McGirt.
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 21 2020Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Oklahoma
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Motion to appoint counsel GRANTED, and Ian H. Gershengorn, Esq., of Washington, D.C., is appointed to serve as counsel for petitioner.
Jan 27 2020Application (19A861) of the Solicitor General and the Muscogee Creek Nation to file briefs as amicus curiae in excess of the word limit, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 27 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Jimcy McGirt.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 04 2020Application (19A861) of the Solicitor General and the Muscogee Creek Nation to file briefs as amicus curiae in excess of the word limit is granted by Justice Sotomayor provided that the briefs do not exceed 11,000 words each.
Feb 04 2020Brief of petitioner Jimcy McGirt filed (with separate appendix).
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Tom Cole, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2020Brief amici curiae of National Indigenous Women's Resource Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Former United States Attorneys Troy A. Eid, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of National Congress of American Indians Fund filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 11 2020Brief amici curiae of Historians, Legal Scholars, and Cherokee Nation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2020Brief amicus curiae of Muscogee (Creek) Nation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 21 2020SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, April 21, 2020.
Feb 24 2020Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
Feb 26 2020Record requested from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma..
Feb 26 2020The record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma, the record has been electronically filed.
Mar 09 2020Record received from the U.S.D.C. Wagoner County of Oklahoma. (1-Box)
Mar 09 2020Brief amici curiae of Seventeen Oklahoma District Attorneys, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 13 2020Brief of respondent Oklahoma filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 19 2020CIRCULATED
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of City of Tulsa filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2020Brief amici curiae of Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc., et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 20 2020Brief amicus curiae of United States filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 20 2020Brief amici curiae of States of Kansas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2020Brief amici curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2020Joint motion of the parties, Muscogee (Creek) Nation, and the Solicitor General for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 30 2020Joint motion of the parties, Muscogee (Creek) Nation, and the Solicitor General for enlargement of time for oral argument and for divided argument granted in part, and the time is divided as follows: 15 minutes for the petitioner, 15 minutes for Muscogee (Creek) Nation, 15 minutes for the respondent, and 15 minutes for the Solicitor General.
Apr 03 2020ORAL ARGUMENT POSTPONED.
Apr 10 2020Reply of petitioner Jimcy McGirt filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2020Argument to be rescheduled for May 2020.
Apr 15 2020RESCHEDULED FOR ARGUMENT on Monday, May 11, 2020.
May 11 2020Argued. For petitioner: Ian H. Gershengorn, Washington, D. C.; and Riyaz A. Kanji, Ann Arbor, Mich. (for Muscogee (Creek) Nation, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Mithun Mansinghani, Solicitor General, Oklahoma City, Okla.; and Edwin S. Kneedler, Deputy Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. (for United States, as amicus curiae.)
Jul 09 2020Judgment REVERSED. Gorsuch, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Ginsburg, Breyer, Sotomayor, and Kagan, JJ., joined. Roberts, C. J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Alito and Kavanaugh, JJ., joined, and in which Thomas, J., joined except as to footnote 9. Thomas, J., filed a dissenting opinion.
Aug 10 2020MANDATE ISSUED.
Aug 10 2020JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Ian Heath Gershengorn
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

IGershengorn@jenner.com
202-639-6869
Party name: Jimcy McGirt
Attorneys for Respondent
Mithun Mansinghani
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
Office of the Oklahoma Attorney General
313 NE 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

mithun.mansinghani@oag.ok.gov
405-522-4392
Party name: Oklahoma
Other
Robert David Cheren
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
2000 Key Tower, 127 Public Square
Cleveland, OH 44114

rcheren@bakerlaw.com
2168616648
Party name: Oklahoma District Attorneys, et al.
Toby Crouse
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General Derek Schmidt
120 S.W. 10th Avenue
2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

toby.crouse@ag.ks.gov
785.368.6693
Party name: States of Kansas, et al.
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
3161 Michelson Dr.
Irvine, CA 92612

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
949-451-3805
Party name: City of Tulsa
Robert Harlan Henry
    Counsel of Record
Robert H. Henry Law Firm
512 N. Broadway Avenue, Suite 230
Oklahoma City, OK 73102

rh@rhhenrylaw.com
405-516-7824
Party name: Tom Cole, Brad Henry, et al.
Keith James Hilzendeger
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, District of Arizona
850 West Adams Street
Suite 201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

keith_hilzendeger@fd.org
6023822700
Party name: National Assoc of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Riyaz Amir Kanji
    Counsel of Record
Kanji & Kantzen, PLLC
303 Detroit Street
Suite 400
Ann Arbor, MI 48104

rkanji@kanjikatzen.com
734-769-5400
Party name: Muscogee (Creek) Nation
Paul Robert Koster
    Counsel of Record
Emory Law School Supreme Court Advocacy Program
1301 Clifton Road
Atlanta, GA 30322

paul.koster@emory.edu
4047273957
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association and National Sheriffs' Association
Mary Kathryn Nagle
    Counsel of Record
Pipestem Law P.C.
320 South Boston Ave, Suite 1705
Tulsa, OK 74103

mknagle@pipestemlaw.com
2024070591
Party name: National Indigenous Women's Resource Center, et al.
Chrissi Ross Nimmo
    Counsel of Record
Cherokee Nation
P.O. Box 1533
Tahlequah, OK 74465-1533

chrissi-nimmo@cherokee.org
9184586998
Party name: Historians, Legal Scholars, and Cherokee Nation
Colette Routel
    Counsel of Record
Mitchell Hamline School of Law
875 Summit Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55105

colette.routel@mitchellhamline.edu
6512906327
Party name: National Congress of American Indians Fund
Lynn H. Slade
    Counsel of Record
Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.
P. O. Box 2168
Albuquerque, NM 87103

lynn.slade@modrall.com
505-259-1828
Party name: Environmental Federation of Oklahoma, Inc.,
Jeffrey B. WallActing Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Jennifer H. Weddle
    Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig
1144 15th Street
Suite 3300
Denver, CO 80202

weddlej@gtlaw.com
3035726565
Party name: Former United States Attorneys Troy A. Eid, Barry R. Grissom, Thomas B. Heffelfinger, David C. Iglesias, Brendan V. Johnson, Wendy Olson, Timothy Q. Purdon, and Danny C. Williams