No. 18-9517 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Kenneth R. Isom, Petitioner
v.
Arkansas
Docketed:June 3, 2019
Linked with 18A1067
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arkansas
   Case Numbers:(CR-17-1003)
   Decision Date:December 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 31, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2019Application (18A1067) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 1, 2019 to May 31, 2019, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Apr 19 2019Application (18A1067) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until May 31, 2019.
May 30 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 3, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Jun 19 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 3, 2019 to August 2, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 21 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 2, 2019.
Aug 02 2019Brief of respondent State of Arkansas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 22 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Oct 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/11/2019.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Julie Pitt Vandiver
    Counsel of Record
Arkansas Federal Defender Office
1401 W. Capitol Ave
Ste. 490
Little Rock, AR 72201

julie_vandiver@fd.org
5013246114
Party name: Kenneth Isom
Attorneys for Respondent
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General of Arkansas
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center St., Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72223

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
2029046690
Party name: State of Arkansas