No. 18-944
Title:Tree of Life Christian Schools, Petitioner
v.
City of Upper Arlington, Ohio
Docketed:January 18, 2019
Linked with 18A555
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4190)
   Decision Date:September 18, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 21 2018Application (18A555) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 17, 2018 to January 16, 2019, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 28 2018Application (18A555) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 16, 2019.
Jan 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Tree of Life Christian Schools.
Blanket Consent
Jan 31 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, City of Upper Arlington, Ohio.
Blanket Consent
Feb 06 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 08 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2019.
Feb 15 2019Brief amicus curiae of Parents of Students of Tree of Life Christian School filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Institute for Religious Freedom filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Association of Christian Schools International filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Center for Law and Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amici curiae of Civil Liberties for Urban Believers, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amici curiae of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Jewish Coalition for Religious Liberty filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of CatholicVote.org Education Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 19 2019Brief amicus curiae of Citizens for Community Values filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2019Brief of City of Upper Arlington, Ohio in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

jbursch@adflegal.org
480-444-0020
Party name: Tree of Life Christian Schools
John J. Bursch
    Counsel of Record
Alliance Defending Freedom
15100 N. 90th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260

jbursch@adflegal.org
480-444-0020
Party name: Tree of Life Christian Schools
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark Landes
    Counsel of Record
Isaac Wiles Burkholder & Teetor LLC
Two Miranova Place, Suite 700
Columbus, OH 43215-0000

mlandes@isaacwiles.com
614-221-2121
Party name: City of Upper Arlington, Ohio
Other
Miles Edward Coleman
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
1320 Main Street, 17 Floor
Columbia, SC 29201

miles.coleman@nelsonmullins.com
803-799-2000
Party name: Islam and Religious Freedom Action Team of the Institute for Religious Freedom
Daniel P. Dalton
    Counsel of Record
DALTON & TOMICH, PLC
719 Griswold Street, Suite 270
Detroit, MI 48226

ddalton@daltontomich.com
313.859.6000
Party name: PARENTS OF STUDENTS OF TREE OF LIFE CHRISTIAN SCHOOL
William Stuart Dornette
    Counsel of Record
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
425 Walnut Street
Suite 1800
Cincinnati, OH 45202

dornette@taftlaw.com
513-381-2838
Party name: Citizens for Community Values
Scott William Gaylord
    Counsel of Record
Elon University School of Law
201 North Greene Street
Greensboro, NC 27401

sgaylord@elon.edu
3362799331
Party name: CatholicVote.org Education Fund
Richard Shawn Gunnarson
    Counsel of Record
Kirton McConkie
Kiront McConckie Building
50 East South Temple
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sgunnarson@kmclaw.com
801-323-5907
Party name: The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-day Saints, et al.
Jeffrey Matthew Harris
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Blvd.
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

jeff@consovoymccarthy.com
703-243-9423
Party name: THE JEWISH COALITION FOR RELIGIOUS LIBERTY
Daniel Patrick Kearney Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr LLP
1875 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

Daniel.Kearney@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Association of Christian Schools International
John W. Mauck
    Counsel of Record
Mauck & Baker, LLC
One North LaSalle Street
Suite 600
Chicago, IL 60602

jmauck@mauckbaker.com
312-726-1243
Party name: Civil Liberties for Urban Believers
Jay Alan Sekulow
    Counsel of Record
American Center for Law and Justice
American Center for Law and Justice
201 Maryland Avenue, N.E.
Washington, DC 20002

sekulow@aclj.org
202-546-8890
Party name: American Center for Law and Justice