No. 18-9424
Title:Lamar Eady, Jr., Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 24, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-14449)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2019
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
May 22 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 24, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of ServiceOther
Jun 03 2019Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Jul 05 2019Response Requested. (Due August 5, 2019)
Jul 31 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 5, 2019 to September 4, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 01 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 4, 2019.
Aug 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 4, 2019 to September 27, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 30 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 27, 2019.
Sep 27 2019Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 16 2019Reply of petitioner Lamar Eady filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 17 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda Greenberg Bryn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
One East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

brenda_bryn@fd.org
954-356-7436
Party name: Lamar Eady
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States