No. 18-9383 | |
Title: | Lakshmi Arunachalam, Petitioner v. United States District Court for the Northern District of California, et al. |
Docketed: | May 22, 2019 |
Linked with 18A858 | |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (18-72569) |
Decision Date: | December 18, 2018 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Feb 11 2019 | Application (18A858) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 18, 2019 to May 17, 2019, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service | |
Feb 25 2019 | Application (18A858) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 17, 2019. |
May 17 2019 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 21, 2019) |
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisAppendixPetitionProof of Service | |
Jun 21 2019 | Waiver of right of respondent UNITED STATES to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Jul 05 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019. |
Oct 07 2019 | Because the Court lacks a quorum, 28 U. S. C. §1, and since the qualified Justices are of the opinion that the case cannot be heard and determined at the next Term of the Court, the judgment is affirmed under 28 U. S. C. §2109, which provides that under these circumstances "the court shall enter its order affirming the judgment of the court from which the case was brought for review with the same effect as upon affirmance by an equally divided court." Justice Thomas, Justice Ginsburg, Justice Breyer, Justice Alito, Justice Sotomayor and Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
Oct 22 2019 | Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Nov 06 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/22/2019. |
Dec 09 2019 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Lakshmi Arunachalam | 222 Stanford Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 | (650) 690-0995 |
Party name: Lakshmi Arunachalam | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Noel J. Francisco Counsel of Record | Solicitor General United States Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20530-0001 SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov | 202-514-2217 |
Party name: UNITED STATES |