No. 18-938
Title:Ritzen Group, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Jackson Masonry, LLC
Docketed:January 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(18-5157, 18-5161)
   Decision Date:October 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 14 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 19, 2019)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 06 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 13 2019Response Requested. (Due April 12, 2019)
Apr 12 2019Brief of respondent Jackson Masonry, LLC in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 17 2019Reply of petitioner Ritzen Group, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 18 2019Rule 29.6 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed.
Apr 23 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/9/2019.
May 13 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jun 09 2019Motion of petitioner for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jun 26 2019Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including August 5, 2019.
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, November 13, 2019.
Aug 05 2019Brief of petitioner Ritzen Group, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 05 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 23 2019Motion for an extension of time to file respondents' brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Aug 29 2019Motion to extend the time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including October 4, 2019.
Sep 03 2019CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Sep 18 2019Record received from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit is electronic.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Shane Gibson Ramsey
    Counsel of Record
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, LLP
150 4th Avenue North, Suite 1100
Nashville, TN 37219

shane.ramsey@nelsonmullins.com
6156645355
Party name: Ritzen Group, Inc.
William C. Wood Jr.Nelson Mullins, et al.
150 Fourth Avenue, North, Suite 1100
Nashville, TN 37219

bill.wood@nelsonmullins.com
(615) 664-5300
Party name: RITZEN GROUP, INC.
Attorneys for Respondent
Griffin S. DunhamDunham Hildebrand, PLLC
1704 Charlotte Avenue, Suite 105
Nashville, TN 37203

ned@dhnashville.com
615-933-5851
Party name: Jackson Masonry, LLC
John Issac Harris IIISchulman, LeRoy & Bennett PC
501 Union Street, 7th Floor
Nashville, TN 37219

jharris@slblawfirm.com
6152446670
Party name: Jackson Masonry, LLC