No. 18-935
Title:Michelle Monasky, Petitioner
v.
Domenico Taglieri
Docketed:January 18, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-4128)
   Decision Date:October 17, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 15 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 19, 2019)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 19, 2019 to March 21, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 11 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 21, 2019.
Feb 19 2019Motion of Sanctuary for Families, National Network to End Domestic Violence, and Pathways to Safety International for leave to file amicus brief not accepted for filing. (February 21, 2019) (Corrected version submitted)
Feb 19 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Sanctuary for Families, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 12 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 21, 2019 to April 5, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 13 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 5, 2019.
Apr 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 5, 2019 to April 19, 2019, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 02 2019Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 19, 2019.
Apr 19 2019Brief of respondent Domenico Taglieri in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 07 2019Reply of petitioner Michelle Monasky filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Sanctuary for Families, et al. GRANTED.
Jun 10 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jul 08 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 09 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 15, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including October 7, 2019.
Aug 15 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Michelle Monasky.
Blanket Consent
Aug 15 2019Brief of petitioner Michelle Monasky filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2019Brief amicus curiae of Reunite International Child Abduction Centre in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Sanctuary for Families, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Frederick K. Cox International Law Center filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, December 11, 2019.
Oct 07 2019Brief of respondent Domenico Taglieri filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 11 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of International Academy of Family Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 14 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Oct 23 2019The record from the U.S.C..A. 6th Circuit is electronic and filed.
Oct 25 2019CIRCULATED
Nov 04 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 06 2019Reply of petitioner Michelle Monasky filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir Cameron Tayrani
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn and Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

atayrani@gibsondunn.com
(202) 887-3692
Party name: Michelle Monasky
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Domenico Taglieri
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
David Alan Carney
    Counsel of Record
Baker & Hostetler LLP
127 Public Square
Suite 2000
Cleveland, OH 44114

dcarney@bakerlaw.com
216-621-0200
Party name: Frederick K. Cox International Law Center
Edwin A. Freedman
    Counsel of Record
Law Offices of Edwin Freedman
58 Harakevet Street
Tel Aviv lsrael, XX 6777016

edwin@edfreedman.com
00-972-3-6966611
Party name: International Academy of Family Lawyers
Michael Alexander Johnson
    Counsel of Record
Arnold & Porter LLP
601 Maassachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001

michael.johnson@aporter.com
20294257000
Party name: Sanctuary for Families, et al.
Kelly Ann Powers
    Counsel of Record
Miles & Stockbridge P.C.
1201 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20004

kpowers@milesstockbridge.com
202-465-8375
Party name: Reunite International Child Abduction Centre
Peter M. Walzer
    Counsel of Record
Walzer Melcher LLP
5941 Variel Avenue
Woodland Hills, CA 91367

pmw@walzermelcher.com
8185913700
Party name: American Academy of Matrimonial Lawyers