No. 18-9297
Title:Jeremy Shane Hall, Petitioner
v.
John Myrick, Superintendent, Two Rivers Correctional Institution
Docketed:May 16, 2019
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-35709)
   Decision Date:October 25, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:January 16, 2019
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 16 2019Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 17, 2019)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixAppendixProof of Service
May 22 2019Waiver of right of respondent John Myrick to respond filed.
Main Document
May 28 2019Waiver of John Myrick of right to respond not accepted for filing. (June 04, 2019)
Jun 05 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/20/2019.
Jun 12 2019Response Requested. (Due July 12, 2019)
Jul 11 2019Brief of respondent John Myrick in opposition filed.
Main Document
Jul 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/1/2019.
Apr 20 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/24/2020.
Apr 27 2020DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/1/2020.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Nell I. Brown
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender for the District of Oregon
101 SW Main Street
Suite 1700
Portland, OR 97204

nell_brown@fd.org
5033262123
Party name: Jeremy Hall
Attorneys for Respondent
Benjamin Noah Gutman
    Counsel of Record
Oregon Department of Justice
1162 Court St NE
Salem, OR 97301

benjamin.gutman@doj.state.or.us
5033784402
Party name: John Myrick